Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5605 Week
» 30439 Month
» 64771 Year
» 1730147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2899 m/e 10/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7661 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67661 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V110/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)02/1959
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1844
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 10/1936
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/02/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys
Information Plain bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1936
DFU   Dunfermline Upper on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EFD   Eastfield w/e 15/01/1949
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield w/e 15/01/1949
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 05/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2899    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7661    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67661    
15/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
05/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67661    
04/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev