Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 428 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4920 Week
» 29754 Month
» 64086 Year
» 1729462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 404 m/e 07/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7662 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67662 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V107/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)02/1955
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1878
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal w/e Mon 14/01/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1938
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B   Heaton w/e 08/12/1962
52A   Gateshead w/e 29/12/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 52B Heaton 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 5w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   on 14/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 404    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7662    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67662    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
14/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67662    
07/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev