Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3804 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13378 Week
» 78332 Month
» 280996 Year
» 3307849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
404 |
m/e |
07/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7662 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67662 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
344 |
Works Number |
1878 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1938 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 14/01/1963 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1938 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52B |
|
Heaton |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/01/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
5w/e |
12/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/01/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/08/1962 |
Polmont MPD |
In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 404 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7662 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67662 |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
14/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67662 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|