Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 377 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4869 Week
» 29703 Month
» 64035 Year
» 1729411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 407 m/e 07/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7663 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67663 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V107/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)02/1956
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1879
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal Mon 23/09/1963
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1938
NOR   Norwich Thorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51D   Middlesbrough on 18/02/1951
51D   Middlesbrough 5w/e 24/03/1951
53B   Hull Botanic Gardens 3w/e 16/06/1956
51D   Middlesbrough 5w/e 20/07/1957
53B   Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 21/09/1957
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 20/06/1959
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough on 18/02/1951
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 18/02/1951
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 14/06/1959
WDN   on 23/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 407    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7663    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67663    
18/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67663    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev