Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1220 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19023 Week
» 72039 Month
» 191566 Year
» 3218419 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
407 |
m/e |
07/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7663 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67663 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
344 |
Works Number |
1879 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 407 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7663 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67663 |
|
|
18/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67663 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|