Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 222 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4568 Week
» 4568 Month
» 71430 Year
» 1736806 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 420 m/e 07/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7664 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67664 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1880
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1938
NOR   Norwich Thorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 14/06/1952
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 24/03/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 07/04/1962
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 M. & G.N. R. Line On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. SLS/194910
14/04/1963 Hurlford MPD (in store) in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 420    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7664    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67664    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67664    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev