Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4601 Week
» 29435 Month
» 63767 Year
» 1729143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 424 m/e 08/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7665 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67665 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1881
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1938
Withdrawal Fri 23/06/1961
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1938
NOR   Norwich Thorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PKD   Parkhead w/e 21/08/1948
KPS   Kipps w/e 11/09/1948
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
     Withdrawn on 23/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKD Parkhead w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC KPS Kipps w/e 11/09/1948
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   on 23/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, i Complete Locos) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 424    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7665    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67665    
21/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD)    
11/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (KPS)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
23/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67665    
08/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev