Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
447 |
m/e |
09/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7667 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67667 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
344 |
Works Number |
1883 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
To Service |
During 09/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/08/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1955 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1946 |
General |
Ex Metro 2-6-4T 6158 was noted on a Chelmsford train on 31/10, and the first recorded instance of a 'V.1' 2-6-2T on a Chingford train was the working of the 5.37 p.m. fast to Chingford by 7667 on 17/9. Out of interest a brief 'log' was made on this trip, and despite several checks through signal delays, speeds were very much higher than usual, and the acceleration most noticeable. A few days previously a 'J.15' 0-6-0 working tender first was on the same turn; another notable type for this line, where 'N.7' and 'F.6' reign supreme. 'J.69’s' have also had this turn, but latterly the normal 'N.7' has been in charge. These turns resulted from a stock working for a Hertford train into Liverpool Street, the engine bringing the coaches in and on release taking the 5.37 p.m. Towards the end of October 8549 (7373) was on the Chingford line for a few days |
SLS/194701 |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
14/04/1963 |
Hurlford MPD (in store) |
in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 447 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7667 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67667 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
23/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
02/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67667 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|