Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 469 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3887 Week
» 28721 Month
» 63053 Year
» 1728429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 447 m/e 09/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7667 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67667 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V109/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)08/1958
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1883
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal Thu 02/08/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NOR   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
STR   Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1949
KL   Kings Lynn w/e 12/11/1949
65A   Eastfield on 23/04/1950
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 24/03/1962
     Withdrawn on 02/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 65A Eastfield on 23/04/1950
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 07/04/1962
WDN   on 02/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1955 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1946 General Ex Metro 2-6-4T 6158 was noted on a Chelmsford train on 31/10, and the first recorded instance of a 'V.1' 2-6-2T on a Chingford train was the working of the 5.37 p.m. fast to Chingford by 7667 on 17/9. Out of interest a brief 'log' was made on this trip, and despite several checks through signal delays, speeds were very much higher than usual, and the acceleration most noticeable. A few days previously a 'J.15' 0-6-0 working tender first was on the same turn; another notable type for this line, where 'N.7' and 'F.6' reign supreme. 'J.69ís' have also had this turn, but latterly the normal 'N.7' has been in charge. These turns resulted from a stock working for a Hertford train into Liverpool Street, the engine bringing the coaches in and on release taking the 5.37 p.m. Towards the end of October 8549 (7373) was on the Chingford line for a few days SLS/194701
31/07/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. SLS/195010
14/04/1963 Hurlford MPD (in store) in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 447    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7667    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
22/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
26/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67667    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL)    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
06/1955 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
02/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67667    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev