Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 446 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3864 Week
» 28698 Month
» 63030 Year
» 1728406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 448 m/e 10/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7668 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67668 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V110/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)05/1954
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1884
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STM   St Margarets w/e 12/03/1949
64C   Dalry Road 4w/e 01/08/1959
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 01/08/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/07/1963 Inverurie Works (Scrapped) Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 448    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7668    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67668    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
05/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67668    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev