Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 89 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1158 Week
» 1158 Month
» 68020 Year
» 1733396 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 451 m/e 10/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7669 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67669 on 19/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V110/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)01/1943
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1885
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Thu 28/09/1961
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65E   Kipps 4w/e 07/05/1960
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
65E   Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
     Withdrawn on 28/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 07/05/1960
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   on 28/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 \"V.3\" Renumbering With the renumbering of 7683 to 67683 on 28/4, the renumbering of class 'V.3' is complete, though the date on which 67669 was done has escaped record (N.B. now believed to have been renumbered in 8/1949). SLS/195007
28/11/1953 Darlington Works North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 451    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7669    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
19/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67669    
02/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
28/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67669    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev