Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 865 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7491 Week
» 32325 Month
» 66657 Year
» 1732033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 469 m/e 10/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7671 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67671 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 344
Works Number 1887
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Thu 07/07/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STR   Stratford 4w/e 25/12/1948
NOR   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
STR   Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1949
KL   Kings Lynn w/e 12/11/1949
65A   Eastfield on 23/04/1950
     Withdrawn on 07/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 65A Eastfield on 23/04/1950
WDN   on 07/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 469    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7671    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
22/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
26/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67671    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL)    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
03/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 67671    
08/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev