Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 82 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6009 Week
» 4747 Month
» 419068 Year
» 1640633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 478 m/e 11/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7673 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67673 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1889
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal Mon 01/10/1962
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 25/11/1950
51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 21/07/1951
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/10/1951
52C Blaydon 4w/e 17/11/1956
52A Gateshead 5w/e 20/04/1957
54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/10/1958
52B Heaton w/e 20/06/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 03/10/1959
52B Heaton w/e 05/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC MID Middlesbrough on 29/01/1950
ALLOC 52B Heaton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 12/08/1961
WDN   on 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1953 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 478    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7673    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67673    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
02/1953 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67673    

prev prev