Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 480 m/e 11/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7674 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67674 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V111/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)08/1957
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1890
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1938
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
65E   Kipps 4w/e 11/02/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 11/02/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 2w/e 21/10/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/07/1957 Darlington Works On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. SLS/195709
11/09/1963 Inverurie Works (Scrapped) In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 480    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7674    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67674    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67674    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev