Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 756 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7382 Week
» 32216 Month
» 66548 Year
» 1731924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 483 m/e 12/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7675 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67675 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V112/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)10/1942
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1891
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 12/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs , 29 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/03/1959
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 2w/e 21/10/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1953 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 483    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7675    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67675    
06/1953 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67675    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev