Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 71 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4417 Week
» 4417 Month
» 71279 Year
» 1736655 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 485 on 29/12/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7676 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67676 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V129/12/1938
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1960
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1892
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service Mon 29/12/1938
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/07/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/12/1938
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PKD   Parkhead w/e 22/01/1949
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
67B   Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 21/04/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKD Parkhead w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 5w/e 12/05/1962
WDN   w/e 30/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/12/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 485    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7676    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67676    
22/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD)    
02/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67676    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev