Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 482 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3900 Week
» 28734 Month
» 63066 Year
» 1728442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 488 on 07/01/1939
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7677 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67677 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V107/01/1939
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1958
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1893
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service Mon 07/01/1939
Withdrawal Mon 01/10/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/01/1939
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PKS   Parkeston Quay w/e 31/07/1948
STR   Stratford w/e 14/08/1948
NOR   Norwich Thorpe w/e 28/08/1948
51D   Middlesbrough on 18/02/1951
51D   Middlesbrough 5w/e 24/03/1951
52B   Heaton 4w/e 20/09/1952
52B   Heaton 4w/e 04/10/1952
51D   Middlesbrough 4w/e 20/06/1953
53B   Hull Botanic Gardens 3w/e 16/06/1956
51D   Middlesbrough 5w/e 20/07/1957
53B   Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 21/09/1957
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 20/06/1959
     Withdrawn on 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough on 18/02/1951
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 18/02/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 14/06/1959
WDN   on 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 M. & G.N. R. Line On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1939 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 488    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7677    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67677    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
14/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
28/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
18/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
11/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67677    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev