|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
02/08/1962 | Polmont MPD | In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 489 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7678 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67678 | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67678 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |