Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 433 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3851 Week
» 28685 Month
» 63017 Year
» 1728393 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 490 m/e 02/1939
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7679 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67679 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V102/1939
V3 (2-6-2T)10/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1895
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 02/1939
Withdrawal Thu 25/01/1962
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1939
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/06/1952
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 25/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   on 25/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1953 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 M. & G.N. R. Line On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. SLS/194910
31/12/1960 Glasgow Suburban Electrification From its anauguration in early November, this proved very popular, the number of passengers more than doubled, but the 'Blue Trains' were dogged by teething troubles which culminated in the transformer explosion in the 7 a.m. Balloch-Bridgeton near Renton on 13th Dec., when the guard and several passengers were seriously injured-an even more destructive explosion had taken place in a train at Charing Cross during a trial run on 30th Oct. Hurried modifications were made in the cooling oil reservoirs so that any leaking gas would be dispelled, but, following a fire under a Helensburgh train near Easterhouse on Saturday, 17th Dec., the decision to withdraw temporarily the service, was made by the General Manager at 3-30 a.m., on 18th Dec.; this was not entirely unexpected as instructions had already been issued to bring engines back into steam. No service was operated that day and the electric trains were transferred, under power to Hyndland depot and Ardmore sidings, while the former steam sets were re-distributed, some of them having been stored at Craigendoran but others had to be brought from as far afield as Dumfries. Many of the locos. were still at Parkhead or Eastfield, some out of action and others used on freight work or the Singer works trains, but at least two V3s (67607/79) had been transferred to Hurlford to replace class 2P's on Kilmarnock locals and others were earmarked for Ardrossan.
From Monday, 19th December, the timetable operated by steam trains prior to 5th Nov. was restored, with additional calls at the new Hyndland and Garscadden stations which have had their island platforms lengthened by temporary wooden extensions. Trains which formerly used Hyndland terminus now 'run round' in Yoker yard. Minor alterations include the starting of two morning trains from Coatbridge instead of Easterhouse. There is no Sunday service and trains are one class only as previously, the workings are shared between Gresley 2-6-2Ts and Ivatt c1.4 2-6-0s (also some standards including 76090/4 from Corkerhill), with an occasional B1 and all trains consist of seven non-corridor coaches of mixed Gresley and early LMS stock. During the first week most were running 10-15 minutes late, the main trouble being lack of water columns which results in much additional empty stock workings, although matters have not been helped by a spell of wintry weather.
The freight workings of Helensburgh shed had been transferred to Dumbarton when the shed was closed after 5th Nov., but it was re-opened from 19th December. On the Central Low Level (Glasgow) Line, a number of trains cut back to Dumbarton or Dalmuir are running through to Balloch again. On withdrawal of the electrics it was officially stated that they would be off for 'anything from a few weeks to six months'; it is now believed that full services may be restored in March and night trials have been taking place on the Milngavie branch. The findings of the M. of T. enquiry held in Glasgow on 22nd and 23rd December, were that the explosions were due to inflammable vapour from the cooling oil of the train transformers being ignited by an electrical spark. These reservoirs are now to be moved outside the guard's compartment for more effective air-cooling.
SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1939 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 490    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7679    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67679    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
10/1953 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
25/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67679    
03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev