Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 181 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 6807 Week
» 31641 Month
» 65973 Year
» 1731349 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 496 m/e 02/1939
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7681 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67681 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V102/1939
V3 (2-6-2T)11/1957
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 345
Works Number 1897
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake
To Service During 02/1939
Withdrawal Thu 16/11/1961
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1939
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   on 16/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1953 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1939 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 496    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7681    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67681    
07/1953 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
16/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67681    
04/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev