|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/01/1939 | 19/01/1939 | 11 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1939 | 19/01/1940 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1940 | 23/03/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1941 | 21/01/1942 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1944 | 26/09/1944 | 37 days | General | MLS Regulator off Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 8 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 835 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1950 | 29/06/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1952 | 17/11/1952 | 10 days | H/C | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1954 | 10/02/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/05/1955 | 31/05/1955 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 03/11/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1956 | 19/06/1956 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1956 | 18/12/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/08/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1958 | 12/02/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1958 | 20/03/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1958 | 13/11/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1959 | 03/12/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1959 | 30/12/1959 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
22/11/1952 | North Eastern Miscellany | On 22nd November last the Green Howards arrived at Barnard Castle for service in Korea; their special was hauled from York by 'V2' No. 60835 (named after the regiment) specially cleaned for the occasion, and was piloted from Darlington to Barney by 'Ll' No. 67792 (being run in ex Works). With the withdrawal on 27/11 of the Kirkby Stephen and Tebay passenger service, Darlington men now run through to Penrith on the 6.18 a.m. and 4.10 p.m. ex Bank Top: as the 2MT's cannot be turned at Penrith, Bank Top now rely on the 'old faithfuls'-super-heated J21 class-to work these for the time being. These old-timers frequently work Saltburn and Richmond turns in company with 'A5's,' 'Ll's' and L.M.R. 2-6-4T's, and one recently worked the, 6.25 a.m. York slow from Bank Top and lost no time. Several drivers prefer these engines to the more modern types for many jobs in this area, they are easy to maintain, light on coal, and very comfortable in riding qualities. No. 45607 Fiji worked a Sheffield-Newcastle football excursion right through on 20.12.1952, leaving Bank Top at 11.40 a.m. Class 4 tanks Nos. 42083/4/5 are ail working in the Bank Top local passenger links. | SLS/195302 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/09/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4806 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1772 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
24/09/1938 | Naming | Named 'THE GREEN HOWARD' | ||
09/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1939. Dep: 19/01/1939. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
29/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1939. Dep: 19/01/1940. | ||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 21/01/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
21/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1944. Dep: 26/09/1944. Work undertaken: MLS Regulator off Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 735 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 835 |
||
09/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60835 | ||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
30/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 29/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. | ||
08/11/1952 | Works Visit | |||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29465 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 10/02/1954. | ||
02/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. | ||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 31/05/1955. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 03/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 19/06/1956. | ||
19/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 18/12/1956. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. | ||
10/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1958. Dep: 12/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29351 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1958. Dep: 20/03/1958. | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1959. Dep: 03/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1959. Dep: 30/12/1959. | ||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
30/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
19/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60835 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |