|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 04/04/1940 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1942 | 12/06/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1950 | 12/05/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60843 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1950 | 22/05/1950 | 5 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 09/06/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/12/1950 | 29/12/1950 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1952 | 26/05/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1952 | 26/09/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1952 | 30/10/1952 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1956 | 20/09/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1957 | 14/08/1957 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 86 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1959 | 13/05/1959 | 20 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1959 | 24/09/1959 | 32 days | General | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1962 | 07/02/1963 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28069 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1963 | 07/03/1963 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/12/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4814 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1780 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 04/04/1940. | ||
06/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1942. Dep: 12/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. | ||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 743 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 843 | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60843 |
||
18/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/05/1950. Dep: 22/05/1950. | ||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950. | ||
05/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950. | ||
20/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 26/05/1952. | ||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952. | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 30/10/1952. | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1956. Dep: 20/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1957. Dep: 14/08/1957. | ||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. | ||
13/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
24/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 13/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
31/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1962. Dep: 07/02/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28069 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1963. Dep: 07/03/1963. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60843 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |