|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1943 | 18/06/1943 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1945 | 08/07/1945 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1947 | 26/07/1947 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1949 | 14/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60929 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1951 | 16/11/1951 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1953 | 08/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1954 | 17/09/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1955 | 11/01/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1957 | 27/03/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1957 | 23/01/1958 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1959 | 12/05/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 28083 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1963 | 03/07/1963 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28067 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1963 | 11/07/1963 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/06/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3656 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1888 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
09/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. | ||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 18/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1945. Dep: 08/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 829 but not taken up | ||
12/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 929 | ||
02/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947. | ||
06/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60929 |
||
01/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951. | ||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
07/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954. | ||
06/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 27/03/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 23/01/1958. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28083 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
21/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1963. Dep: 03/07/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28067 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1963. Dep: 11/07/1963. | ||
21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60929 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |