|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/05/1943 | 29/06/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 26 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 933 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1948 | 03/04/1948 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60933 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1950 | 30/03/1950 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/07/1951 | 12/07/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1951 | 27/08/1951 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1951 | 05/09/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1952 | 23/05/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1952 | 21/10/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1955 | 24/06/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | Collision damage |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1956 | 21/12/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1958 | 14/10/1958 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1960 | 01/04/1960 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1960 | 29/04/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/10/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3660 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1892 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1943. Dep: 29/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 833 but not taken up | ||
10/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 933 |
||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. | ||
01/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60933 |
||
23/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1950. Dep: 30/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1951. Dep: 12/07/1951. | ||
16/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1951. Dep: 27/08/1951. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 05/09/1951. | ||
24/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1952. Dep: 23/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 21/10/1952. | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1955. Dep: 24/06/1955. Work undertaken: Collision damage |
||
16/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1958. Dep: 14/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960. | ||
24/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1960. Dep: 29/04/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
11/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
17/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60933 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |