|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 10508 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60977 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1951 | 10/02/1951 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1954 | 26/01/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1954 | 16/02/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1954 | 22/10/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1955 | 21/12/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/03/1957 | 26/04/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1958 | 04/03/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1959 | 21/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1959 | 20/11/1959 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1959 | 06/01/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1960 | 16/09/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1962 | 22/01/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
28/02/1962 | First Gresley V2\'s condemned | The first inroads were made to the famous Gresley Class V2 2-6-2 locos. when 60850 of Doncaster (36A), 60960 of Thornaby (51L) and 60977 of York (50A) were simultaneously condemned during February. The latter was one of the four locos. involved in the Connington accident last December and was damaged beyond repair. | SLS/196205 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/10/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3689 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1919 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 877 but not taken up | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 977 | ||
12/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. | ||
19/07/1949 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29396 boiler fitted | ||
19/07/1949 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 2962 boiler fitted | ||
01/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10508 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60977 |
||
16/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951. | ||
21/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 26/01/1954. | ||
09/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 16/02/1954. | ||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 22/10/1954. | ||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 21/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957. | ||
03/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 04/03/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1959. Dep: 20/11/1959. | ||
30/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960. | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 16/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 22/01/1962. | ||
26/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60977 from York (North) (50A) | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |