Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 545 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18348 Week
» 71364 Month
» 190891 Year
» 3217744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
148 |
m/e |
04/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8182 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
68182 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
Works Number |
8477 |
To Service |
During 04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/01/1958 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 148 Built at Sentinel, Works Number 8477 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8182 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68182 |
|
|
24/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
27/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68182 |
|
|