|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 09/10/1922 | 23/12/1922 | 76 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 12/03/1925 | 22/05/1925 | 72 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7228 |
||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1927 | 08/07/1927 | 87 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 13/07/1929 | 27/09/1929 | 77 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 11/06/1932 | 30/09/1932 | 112 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1935 | 25/09/1935 | 38 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/11/1937 | 28/12/1937 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 210 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/04/1942 | 05/05/1942 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 229 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/04/1947 | 06/06/1947 | 43 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 229 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/06/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 08/06/1949 | Light Casual | |||||
Stratford Works | 28/02/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 23970 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/02/1954 | 15/04/1954 | 60 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1958 | Locomotive Statement | 4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. | SLS/195803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 228 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1584 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 40 boiler fitted |
||
09/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. | ||
12/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1925. Dep: 22/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7228 |
||
13/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1927. Dep: 08/07/1927. | ||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 27/09/1929. | ||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 30/09/1932. | ||
19/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1935. Dep: 25/09/1935. | ||
22/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 28/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 210 (Diagram 40) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
11/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1942. Dep: 05/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 229 (Diagram 40) |
||
27/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) |
||
01/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8126 | ||
25/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1947. Dep: 06/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 229 (Diagram 40) |
||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. | ||
08/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68126 | ||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 08/06/1949. | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 23970 (Diagram 40) |
||
15/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1954. Dep: 15/04/1954. | ||
23/10/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68126 from Stratford (30A) |