|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 08/12/1958 | n/a | 09/12/1958 | 03/02/1959 | Unknown Regime Repairs prior to return to NBL |
57 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 28/05/1959 | 114 days | 28/05/1959 | 19/06/1959 | Unclassified | 23 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 05/10/1962 | 1204 days | 09/10/1962 | 02/11/1962 | Heavy Casual | 25 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 20/02/1963 | 110 days | 25/02/1963 | 20/03/1963 | Heavy Casual | 24 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 10/03/1964 | 356 days | 10/03/1964 | 25/03/1964 | Unclassified | 16 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 28/04/1964 | 34 days | 28/04/1964 | 21/05/1964 | Unknown Regime Component change |
24 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | n/a | 14/02/1965 | Unknown Regime Seen in ‘A’ shop - still there on 9/5/65 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/11/1958 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D603, name: CONQUEST Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27663 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
||
09/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 09/12/1958. Dep: 03/02/1959. Stopped on 08/12/1958 Work undertaken: Repairs prior to return to NBL |
||
28/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Stopped on 28/05/1959 |
||
09/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. Stopped on 05/10/1962 |
||
25/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1963. Dep: 20/03/1963. Stopped on 20/02/1963 |
||
10/03/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1964. Dep: 25/03/1964. Stopped on 10/03/1964 |
||
28/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 28/04/1964. Dep: 21/05/1964. Stopped on 28/04/1964 Work undertaken: Component change |
||
14/02/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 14/02/1965. Work undertaken: Seen in ‘A’ shop - still there on 9/5/65 |
||
31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 603 | ||
08/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |