Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 75 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4990 Week
» 16227 Month
» 249147 Year
» 1914523 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6041 19/09/1966
TOPS (Tops) 73134 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/10/1985 Woking Homes 1885-1985

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 19/09/1966
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) on 19/09/1966
   Stored Serviceable (Ramsgate) on 04/08/1981


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1966 To Service To service as E6041
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73134    
19/10/1985 Naming Named 'Woking Homes 1885-1985' by Mrs P Bohling, Mayoress of Woking at Waterloo station    

prev prev