Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 475 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 84340 Month
» 287004 Year
» 3313857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6109 |
07/04/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/04/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/04/1962 |
Unknown |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
28/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
27/02/1961 |
15/03/1961 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
31,764 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
19/09/1961 |
20/09/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
48,541 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
05/09/1962 |
20/10/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
46 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
|
27/03/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
20/05/1964 |
12/06/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
24 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
09/03/1965 |
17/03/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
9 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
16/09/1966 |
13/01/1967 |
General |
|
|
|
120 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
25/02/1967 |
13/03/1967 |
Power Unit |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
30/03/1967 |
16/05/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
48 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
07/07/1967 |
25/08/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
50 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6109 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27690 Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/02/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1961. Dep: 15/03/1961. |
|
|
19/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1961. Dep: 20/09/1961. |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/09/1962. Dep: 20/10/1962. |
|
|
27/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Dep: 27/03/1964. |
|
|
20/05/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1964. Dep: 12/06/1964. |
|
|
09/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1965. Dep: 17/03/1965. |
|
|
16/09/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1966. Dep: 13/01/1967. |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Power Unit) - Arr: 25/02/1967. Dep: 13/03/1967. |
|
|
30/03/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1967. Dep: 16/05/1967. |
|
|
07/07/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1967. Dep: 25/08/1967. |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6109 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|