Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16445 Week
» 69461 Month
» 188988 Year
» 3215841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6110 |
20/05/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/05/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/05/1962 |
Unknown |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
11/07/1961 |
17/11/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
130 days |
|
52,994 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
03/09/1962 |
02/02/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
153 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
24/04/1963 |
08/06/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
46 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
31/03/1964 |
10/04/1964 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
11 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
01/09/1964 |
11/09/1964 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
11 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
25/06/1965 |
14/09/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
82 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
01/11/1965 |
05/11/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
17/02/1967 |
07/03/1967 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6110 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27840 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. |
|
|
03/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 02/02/1963. |
|
|
24/04/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1963. Dep: 08/06/1963. |
|
|
31/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1964. Dep: 10/04/1964. |
|
|
01/09/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1964. Dep: 11/09/1964. |
|
|
25/06/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1965. Dep: 14/09/1965. |
|
|
01/11/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1965. Dep: 05/11/1965. |
|
|
17/02/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/02/1967. Dep: 07/03/1967. |
|
|
14/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6110 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|