Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 337 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4314 Week
» 15551 Month
» 248471 Year
» 1913847 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6128 m/e 10/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 269
To Service During 10/1931
Withdrawal Fri 26/03/1965
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1931
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 13/08/1960
81B   Slough 4w/e 24/03/1962
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
81C   Southall w/e 08/11/1964
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 2w/e 10/01/1965
     Withdrawn on 26/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 04/01/1965
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1950 Ramblers Excursions Several Sunday Special Ramblers' Excursions were run by the W.R. from Paddington last summer to Henley-on-Thames, Marlow, and Princes Risborough (where a special trip down the Watlington branch was made by the branch engine and single coach). One of the trips to Henley was a 12-coach train hauled by 2-6-0 No. 6360, which was unable to keep time with this heavy load. On an excursion to Marlow, 2-6-2T No. 6123 did much better with 9 coaches of 'Cornish Riviera' stock. The train-very crowded-had to be limited to nine coaches because of the reversal necessary at Bourne End, where the passing loop (used to run the engine round) would not allow a longer train. Ordinarily, the Bourne End-Marlow branch sees nothing more exciting than a single-coach train drawn by a 14xx 0-4-2T. The Princes Risborough train of ten coaches, hauled by 2-6-2T No. 6128, called at Ealing Broadway (as did the others) and thence got to the High Wycombe line via the West Ealing-Greenford loop. The load and gradients seemed too much for this engine to keep time on the down journey. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6128
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
26/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6128    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev