Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4804 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 83801 Month
» 286465 Year
» 3313318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6130 |
27/10/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
27/10/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/11/1962 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
09/04/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6130 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27860 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/11/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
09/04/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6130 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|