Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 986 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2060 Week
» 27421 Month
» 260341 Year
» 1925717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6134 m/e 10/1932

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 278
To Service During 10/1932
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1932
DID   Didcot 4w/e 31/12/1949
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953
84D   Leamington 4w/e 30/11/1957
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 22/03/1958
81C   Southall 2w/e 10/01/1965
81F   Oxford 6w/e 19/09/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DID Didcot 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 19/09/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
24/03/1963 Wolverhampton Works (Works) Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. SLS/196304
15/05/1963 Derby Works (Works) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. SLS/196304
18/05/1963 Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (Ex Works) In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6134
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (DID)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6134    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev