Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 312 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4289 Week
» 15526 Month
» 248446 Year
» 1913822 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6306 m/e 12/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 211
Works Number 2806
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Tue 21/11/1961
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1920
32   St Philips Marsh on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
KDR   Kidderminster 8w/e 23/03/1946
WOS   Worcester 4w/e 20/04/1946
KDR   Kidderminster m/e 31/03/1948
WOS   Worcester m/e 30/06/1948
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/07/1954
87H   Neyland 4w/e 06/09/1958
84J   Croes Newydd 4w/e 18/06/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC WOS Worcester m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 18/06/1960
WDN   m/e 30/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1945 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6306
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2806
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (32)    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
31/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J)    
21/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 6306    

prev prev