Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 345 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4322 Week
» 15559 Month
» 248479 Year
» 1913855 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6326 m/e 03/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 212
Works Number 2826
To Service During 03/1921
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1921
Sw Wks   Swindon Works on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
HFD   Hereford 4w/e 21/02/1948
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/07/1955
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 24/03/1956
85C   Hereford 8w/e 20/04/1957
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/06/1958
88L   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
83B   Taunton 4w/e 28/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HFD Hereford 4w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 31/12/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1957 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/01/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). SLS/196203
04/03/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6326
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2826
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swindon Works (Sw Wks)    
21/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (HFD)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
07/1957 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6326    

prev prev