Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4892 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20504 Week
» 119149 Month
» 321813 Year
» 3348666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6338 |
29/03/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/03/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6338 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27911 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6338 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|