Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 979 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2053 Week
» 27414 Month
» 260334 Year
» 1925710 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6340 m/e 06/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 212
Works Number 2840
To Service During 06/1921
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1921
111   Oxford on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
81E   Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1950
85A   Worcester 8w/e 20/04/1957
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 18/05/1957
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/06/1957
83D   Laira 4w/e 28/01/1961
83B   Taunton 4w/e 22/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 22/04/1961
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1950 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704
31/03/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. SLS/194705
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812
26/03/1961 Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shops) Erecting Shops: 1424, 1504, 2247, 4250, 4611, 5202/5/16/21/49, 5569, 6340/78, 6764, 6849, 7307, 8795, 9401/90, 9796. Awaiting Works: 3617/93, 4232. Being cut-up: 3778, 7422, 6411. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6340
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2840
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (111)    
01/1950 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
25/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6340    

prev prev