Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3682 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17088 Week
» 70104 Month
» 189631 Year
» 3216484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6348 |
14/06/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/06/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6348 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27921 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6348 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/07/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|