Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1398 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20309 Week
» 85263 Month
» 287927 Year
» 3314780 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6351 |
27/06/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
27/06/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6351 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27924 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|
30/11/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6351 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|