Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 808 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6208 Week
» 24260 Month
» 257180 Year
» 1922556 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6364 m/e 05/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 230
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/11/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1925
44   Banbury on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
84C   Banbury 4w/e 31/10/1959
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 30/01/1960
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/11/1960
84G   Kidderminster 4w/e 06/10/1962
2L   Leamington w/e 22/02/1964
2P   Kidderminster w/e 08/08/1964
2C   Stourbridge Junction w/e 15/08/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 21/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2L Leamington 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 2P Kidderminster 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 21/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6364
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (44)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
08/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (2P)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
21/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6364    

prev prev