Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 970 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2044 Week
» 27405 Month
» 260325 Year
» 1925701 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6367 m/e 10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 230
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
107   Llanelly on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
84K   Chester West 4w/e 21/03/1953
84B   Oxley 4w/e 19/06/1954
84K   Chester West 4w/e 17/07/1954
85A   Worcester 4w/e 25/01/1958
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 09/08/1958
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 06/09/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 04/10/1958
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/01/1959
84C   Banbury 4w/e 28/01/1961
81E   Didcot 4w/e 02/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 81E Didcot 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6367
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llanelly (107)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6367    

prev prev