Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 994 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2068 Week
» 27429 Month
» 260349 Year
» 1925725 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6382 m/e 08/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3814
To Service During 08/1921
Withdrawal Mon 21/11/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1921
172   Westbury on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
WOS   Worcester 4w/e 25/12/1948
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 26/02/1949
85A   Worcester 4w/e 03/10/1953
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 08/10/1955
85C   Hereford 4w/e 04/10/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 13/08/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/08/1960
WDN   on 21/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1948 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901
19/02/1961 Swindon Works ('C' Shop) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6382
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3814
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Westbury (172)    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
11/1948 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
21/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6382    

prev prev