Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 8 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2083 Week
» 27444 Month
» 260364 Year
» 1925740 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6394 m/e 11/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3826
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1921
54   Chester West on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 25/11/1953
81D   Reading (W.R.) 8w/e 26/03/1955
83C   Exeter 4w/e 13/07/1957
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 05/10/1957
2P   Kidderminster w/e 07/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TN Taunton 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1950 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. SLS/194705
18/02/1961 Lydney MPD On shed on 18th February-1623/7/31/2/42, 2289, 3721, 6415, 7741 whilst 6394 was stored-the latter used to work the Stoke Gifford goods via the Severn Bridge till latter was damaged. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6394
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3826
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (54)    
01/1950 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (2P)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6394    

prev prev