Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15832 Week
» 68848 Month
» 188375 Year
» 3215228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D64 |
09/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45045 |
02/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
09/04/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
08/05/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1986 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D64 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
29/04/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'COLDSTREAM GUARDSMAN' |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45045 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45045 |
|
|
10/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|