Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 725 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6125 Week
» 24177 Month
» 257097 Year
» 1922473 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6416 on 23/11/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 294
To Service Mon 23/11/1934
Withdrawal Mon 23/09/1963
Service Life 28 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/11/1934
CVCYS     8w/e 23/03/1946
CVAYN     4w/e 20/04/1946
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 23/02/1957
88A   Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/08/1958
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC AYN Abercynon 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/08/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/10/1963 Swindon Works (Dump) Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/11/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6416
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation      
20/04/1946 Allocation      
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
23/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6416    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev