Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16319 Week
» 69335 Month
» 188862 Year
» 3215715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6427 |
on |
13/11/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
300 |
To Service |
Tue 13/11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/08/1958 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
16/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6427 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Merthyr Tydfil (MTHR) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
12/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6427 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|