Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 835 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6235 Week
» 24287 Month
» 257207 Year
» 1922583 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6433 on 15/03/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 305
To Service Mon 15/03/1937
Withdrawal Mon 14/01/1963
Service Life 25 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/03/1937
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 18/05/1946
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 14/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/03/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6433
Built at Swindon Works
   
18/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
14/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6433    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev