Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 792 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6192 Week
» 24244 Month
» 257164 Year
» 1922540 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6435 on 03/04/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 305
To Service Fri 03/04/1937
Withdrawal Fri 09/10/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/04/1937
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 30/11/1957
88H   Tondu 4w/e 11/08/1962
83E   Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 09/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 05/10/1964
WDN   w/e 12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/03/1961 South Wales loans The following locomotives are on loan as follows-1607 to NCB Gwaun-cae-Gurwen, 1611 to C.E.G.B. Tir John, 1665 NCB Pantyfynnon, 3670 NCB Maerdy, 6435 NCB Penallta, 7414 Sir J. McAlpine, Gatewen, 8727 NCB Hafod, 8732 NCB Yriscedwyn, 8735 NCB Abercwmboi. SLS/196104
26/11/1963 Yeovil MPD 0-6-0PTs GWR6400/12/30/5 are now allocated and GWR1442/51 have been placed in store from 26th November. SLS/196401
17/10/1965 Final GWR Cavalcade A Final GWR Cavalcade BIRMINGHAM-BRISTOL On Sunday, 17th October, it is proposed to run a special train from Birmingham to Worcester and Bristol utlising a 66XX Birmingham to Worcester, the two Dartington Trust Ashburton branch locomotives 1420 an 6435 from Worcester to Bristol and 7029 Clun Castle Bristol to Birmingham; this will be the final main line run of 1420 and 6435 before their sojourn on the Ashburton branch and it is expected that Clun Castle will be withdrawn after 20th November. SLS/196509

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/04/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6435
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
09/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6435    

prev prev