Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 775 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6175 Week
» 24227 Month
» 257147 Year
» 1922523 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6436 on 07/04/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 305
To Service Thu 07/04/1937
Withdrawal Thu 27/09/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/04/1937
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 03/12/1955
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1955
88H   Tondu 4w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 88H Tondu m/e 30/06/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6436
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
27/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6436    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev